THE HAVEN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We no longer run a Charity Shop , we have very little fundraising now
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 09 December 1996: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynne Sheppard | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Amanda Ditchburn | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOY ROSA COLLYER-GIBBS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN ALAN WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHLEEN MARGARET HARVEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DARIEN CHRISTINE WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.48k | £3.28k | £10.23k | £2.17k | £5.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.32k | £37.90k | £27.86k | £12.79k | £25.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12TH NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE YOUNG ADULTS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES BY THE PROVISION OF PERMANENT ACCOMODATION IN WEST SURREY AND ELSEWHERE AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND EDUCATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
WEST SURREY AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 BOUNDARY COTTAGES
DORKING ROAD
CHILWORTH
GUILDFORD
GU4 8RR
- Phone:
- 01483202385
- Email:
- collyergibbs@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window