Accounts and annual returns BURY ST EDMUNDS CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING SERVICE: TIME TO LISTEN

Charity number: 1059489
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2010 31 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2010 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2009 14 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2009 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2008 24 February 2009 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2008 Not Required