THE KARL POPPER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to advance the education of the public in the philosophy, ideas, life and writings of Karl Popper, and to other charities/charitable purposes favoured by Karl Popper during his lifetime.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 November 1996: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Margaret Shearmur | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Huw Thomas | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ali Paya | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Violeta Isabela Fairclough | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Frank Goddard Shearmur | Trustee | 24 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95 | £95 | £57 | £57 | £94 | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.19k | £2.50k | £7.50k | £3.00k | £11.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 December 2024 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 January 2024 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT WINCHESTER ON 13 DECEMBER 1994 AS VARIED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 9 SEPTEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PHILOSOPHY, IDEAS, LIFE AND WRITINGS OF KARL POPPER, ESPECIALLY IN THE SPHERES OF SCIENTIFIC METHOD, CRITICAL RATIONALISM AND THE VIRTUES OF THE OPEN SOCIETY AND (2) FOR SUCH CHARITIES AND FOR SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES (BEING CHARITIES OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES FAVOURED BY KARL POPPER DURING HIS LIFETIME) IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 MOUNT STREET
COVENTRY
CV5 8DE
- Phone:
- 02476714540
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window