TY CROESO (YSTRADGYNLAIS AND DISTRICT) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Compelementary therapies, friendship and support, lunch provided, transport provided.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Powys
Governance
- 29 November 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN ANN PRICE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Richard Bush | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP WILLIAM MORGAN | Trustee | 08 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARY MAUREEN BAMBER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN MCNICHOLAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH PARCELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.44k | £54.15k | £38.42k | £46.00k | £45.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.25k | £44.26k | £51.90k | £61.98k | £66.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.10k | £18.10k | £5.06k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 JULY 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM LONG TERM OR TERMINAL ILLNESS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 HEOL EGLWYS
YSTRADGYNLAIS
SWANSEA
SA9 1EY
- Phone:
- 01639844414
- Email:
- ty_croeso@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window