THE COUNCIL FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS RECREATION AND EDUCATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 November 1996: Standard registration
- 22 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CAARE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.87k | £2.18k | £24.15k | £44.80k | £24.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.47k | £1.85k | £21.23k | £44.35k | £28.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCAION BY UNDERTAKING, PROMOTING AND COMMISSIONING RESEARCH INTO THE EFFECT ENHANCED FACILITIES IN THE ARTS, RECREATION AND EDUCATION HAS ON SOCIETY. TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND FACILITIES FOR THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR BY THE GIVING OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER ASSISTANCE TO SUCH CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window