CHERITON FITZPAINE CHARITY

Charity Number: 1059520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide assistance, financial or otheerwise, to needy persons in the parish of Cheriton Fitzpaine. Also to maintain the area known as The Hayes, an area for the benefit of the residents of Cheriton Fitzpaine.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 15 September 2023

Total income: £890
Total expenditure: £98

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 November 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHARITY KNOWN AS HARRIS' GIFT (Previous name)
  • CHARITY OF ANN PARKHOUSE (Previous name)
  • CHARITY OF ELIZABETH PARKHOUSE FOR THE NATIONAL SCHOOL (Previous name)
  • CHARITY OF ELIZABETH PARKHOUSE FOR THE POOR (Previous name)
  • CHARITY OF JOHN TUCKETT (Previous name)
  • CHARITY OF MARY PARKHOUSE FOR THE NATIONAL SCHOOL (Previous name)
  • POOR'S LAND INCLUDING COURTENEY'S GIFT (Previous name)
  • POOR'S MONEY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin Dibley Chair 22 January 2020
SCUTT'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Julia Helen Metcalf Trustee 28 March 2024
SCUTT'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Stephen John Sandford Trustee 06 March 2024
SCUTT'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Janet Margaret May Trustee 22 November 2022
STOCKLEIGH POMEROY RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
SCUTT'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Charles David Sheldrick Trustee 19 November 2015
SCUTT'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
HAZEL ELIZABETH NORTON FBOO Trustee 27 May 2013
SCUTT'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
NIGEL JOHN SKUSE Trustee
SCUTT'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN NEVISON WILSON Trustee
SCUTT'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/09/2019 15/09/2020 15/09/2021 15/09/2022 15/09/2023
Total gross income £2.41k £836 £7.83k £1.06k £890
Total expenditure £1.19k £878 £182 £922 £98
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 September 2023 05 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 15 September 2022 23 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 15 September 2021 21 November 2022 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 15 September 2020 01 September 2021 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 15 September 2019 07 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 WORDLAND CROSS
CHERITON FITZPAINE
CREDITON
EX17 4JR
Phone:
01363866112
Website:

No information available