Accounts and annual returns THE MARJORIE NASH CAT RESCUE

Charity number: 1059523
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 28 August 2024 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 28 August 2024 120 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 02 May 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 08 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 27 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required