DIAL U.K.
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
2nd tier support organisation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 December 1996: Standard registration
- 03 June 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 03 June 2009: Funds transferred to 208231 SCOPE
- DIAL UK (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £663.98k | £420.90k | £121.29k | £95.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £679.58k | £438.06k | £135.60k | £133.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 04 February 2008 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 01 February 2008 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 04 February 2008 | 369 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 16 May 2007 | 105 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 16 February 2006 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 19 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 19 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14/3/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 29/11/1989, 8/09/1990, 21/09/1991, 10/02/1993, 28/02/1996, 8/10/1996, 11/9/1997 AND 6/11/1998.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PERSONS THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, PRACTICAL HELP AND SUPPORTIVE COUNSELLING. THIS SHALL BE DONE THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A NETWORK OF LOCAL INDEPENDENT ASSOCIATIONS STAFFED AND MANAGED BY PERSONS WITH PERSONAL EXPERIENCE OF DISABILITY.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window