CREWE AND NANTWICH ADVANCED MOTORISTS
Charity number: 1059553
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Road safety education / Driver improvement courses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Total income: £1,000
Total expenditure: £866
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
Registration history:
- 02 December 1996: Standard registration
- 14 December 2017: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 14 December 2017: Funds transferred to 1112887 CHESTER AND NANTWICH ADVANCED DRIVERS
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- CHESHIRE ADVANCED MOTORISTS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.39k | £1.09k | £1.45k | £1.14k | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.56k | £498 | £686 | £722 | £866 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 18 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 10 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 02 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 11 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE STANDARD OF DRIVING AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF ROAD SAFETY
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window