Financial history WILFRID BLUNT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1059579
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £12.08k £8.09k £10.77k £10.69k £10.15k
Total expenditure £4.46k £1.06k £804 £950 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A