HIMMAT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting young people, vulnerable adults, women, the elderly, those under-privileged and deprived within our community through education, sports, training and enrichment activities. Provision of activities to improve educational attainment, life chances, improving community engagement and cohesion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £292,766 from 15 government contract(s) and £67,760 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 04 December 1996: Standard registration
- HIMMAT (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abu Bakar Dar | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aamina Khan | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
SHABIR HUSSAIN | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Mohammed Zhabair Yousaf | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
SABIR HUSSAIN | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £228.66k | £308.62k | £562.21k | £513.25k | £360.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £383.77k | £368.30k | £485.76k | £579.62k | £538.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £185.10k | N/A | £292.77k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £215.81k | £60.91k | N/A | £67.76k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £60.91k | £104.78k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £501.27k | £408.41k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £28 | £65 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £485.76k | £579.62k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £69.75k | £61.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 March 2021 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PERSONS LIVING IN WEST YORKSHIRE AND IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING COUNSELLING AND EDUCATION TO YOUNG ASIAN OFFENDERS AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS 2) TO PROMOTE OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR YOUNG PERSONS LIVING IN WEST YORKSHIRE AS THE COMMITTEE MEMBERS MAY DETERMINE
Area of benefit
WEST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Himmat Limited
Lower Ground Floor
Raven Street
Halifax
West Yorkshire
HX1 4NB
- Phone:
- 07801275674
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window