Financial history INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR LIFE TRUST

Charity Number: 1059607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.13m £4.74m £6.64m £6.90m £7.12m
Total expenditure £8.34m £6.78m £7.84m £7.97m £8.25m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £863.55k £139.10k N/A £19.39k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £39.46k £0
Income - Other trading activities £2.66m £791.74k £2.39m £2.33m £2.10m
Income - Charitable activities £1.26m £976.56k £987.01k £891.96k £1.23m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.38m £2.18m £2.41m £2.65m £2.75m
Income - Other £824.04k £792.99k £844.56k £988.22k £1.04m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £39.46k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.01m £3.51m £4.10m £3.97m £4.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.46m £1.43m £1.93m £1.96m £1.94m
Expenditure - Governance £30.57k £31.14k £40.71k £37.96k £34.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £14.26k £13.63k £14.62k £13.43k £18.77k
Expenditure - Other £1.87m £1.84m £1.80m £2.04m £2.06m