Trustees INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR LIFE TRUST
Charity Number: 1059607

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor Andrew Ethan Herridge | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laura Strain | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mathen Kumar Ganesan | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ryan | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Robert Downes | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Tracey Michelle Stonehouse | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jane Robinson | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
FIONA CRUICKSHANK OBE | Trustee | 07 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
LUCY WINSKELL OBE DL | Trustee | 07 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
LINDA CONLON MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.