FRED ROCHE FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is named to honour Fred Roche who did much to create Milton Keynes. It promotes high quality planning, urban design and landscaping in new urban developments. The Memorial Fund maintains the Fred Roche Gardens, funds awards for local students studying planning and related subjects and holds seminars and lectures to inform the debate about the future growth of Milton Keynes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Milton Keynes
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 05 December 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP MURPHY | Chair | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jon Muncaster Mr | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
KIERA MARGARET TUNLEY | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Sarah Brown | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JOHN SKELTON | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|||||
PETER FRANCIS HOWARD | Trustee | 18 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE ROCHE | Trustee | 18 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROLAND NEIL ELLIOTT HIGSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.31k | £686 | £3.51k | £1.13k | £835 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.51k | £4.21k | £766 | £3.46k | £287 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 February 2025 | 240 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2023 | 320 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 266 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 01 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 11 MARCH 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 11 JULY 1996
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE RELIEF OF YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION ADVICE AND COUNSELLING AND BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION TRANSPORT AND OTHER FACILITIES (2) FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Walton Road
Walnut Tree
Milton Keynes
MK7 7AF
- Phone:
- 07711 664 313
- Email:
- Philip@prempm.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window