THE ZOE CARSS EDUCATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust has as its primary objective the advancement of education, at the pre-primary, primary and secondary levels in developing countries. It operates mainly in sub Saharan Africa to a lesser extent in the Indian sub continent. Activities include providing, building and equipment, training teachers, supporting projects and research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Ghana
- Kenya
- Liberia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Nepal
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- Sri Lanka
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 09 December 1996: Standard registration
- 11 January 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE ZOE CARSS MEMORIAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.99k | £117.89k | £134.95k | £134.55k | £80.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £269.91k | £198.63k | £220.34k | £406.10k | £563.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 12 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 12 June 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 25 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 26 June 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 22 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 22 June 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 20TH NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AT THE PRIMARY AND SECONDARY LEVELS, IN SUCH DEVELOPING COUNTRIES, AS MAY BE SELECTED BY THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME. FOR THIS PURPOSE A DEVELOPING COUNTRY IS ANY COUNTRY WHICH MEANS THE WORLD BANK DEFINITION OF HAVING LOW TO MIDDLE INCOME PER CAPITA GNP. INITIALLY THE ACTIVITIES OF THE TRUST WILL BE FOCUSED ON NEPAL AND SOUTH AFRICA.
Area of benefit
INITIALLY, NEPAL AND SOUTH AFRICA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window