INSTITUTE OF EMPLOYMENT RIGHTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE PRODUCE PUBLICATIONS, ORGANISE SEMINARS AND CONFERENCES AND OFFER ADVICE TO ORGANISATIONS, POLICY MAKERS AND INDIVIDUALS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 December 1996: Standard registration
- 29 July 1997: Standard registration
- 29 July 1997: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 29 July 1997: Funds transferred to 1038960 INSTITUTE OF EMPLOYMENT RIGHTS
- IER (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord JOHN HENDY KC | Chair |
|
||||||
GEOFFREY DAVID SHEARS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR KEITH EWING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.76k | £94.55k | £145.51k | £142.79k | £145.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.02k | £101.52k | £129.50k | £153.06k | £147.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6TH APRIL 1989, AMENDED BY SPECIAL ,RESOLUTION INCORPORATED 30TH JUNE 1989 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 26TH NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ISSUES CONNECTED WITH LABOUR LAW, UNEMPLOYMENT, WORK AND ANY RELATED MATTERS; AND TO RESEARCH, COMMISSION, ENCOURAGE AND SPONSOR RESEARCH IN ANY OF THE ABOVE SUBJECTS AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4TH FLOOR
JACK JONES HOUSE
1 ISLINGTON
LIVERPOOL
L3 8EG
- Phone:
- 01512075265
- Email:
- office@ier.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window