THE CHRISTOPHER BUCKINGHAM APPEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise money through various fundraising activities to help children in Grantham and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 09 December 1996: Standard registration
- THE JOURNAL CHILDRENS FUND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Dixon | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marie Bond | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Evans | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.62k | £2.35k | £2.62k | £3.78k | £3.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.14k | £3.79k | £7.75k | £1.12k | £6.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AMONGST YOUNG PERSONS UP TO THE AGE OF FOURTEEN YEARS(AND IN EXTRAORDINARY CASES AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE UP TO EIGHTEEN YEARS)WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA AT THE TIME OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA WITHIN THE GRANTHAM JOURANAL NEWSPAPER IS DISTRIBUTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
GRANTHAM JOURNAL CO LTD
ST PETER'S HOUSE
ST PETER'S HILL
GRANTHAM
LINCOLNSHIRE
NG31 6QB
- Phone:
- 01476541428
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window