WOUGHTON-ON-THE-GREEN CHURCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Proclaiming the gospel of Jesus Christ by regularly holding services, performing baptisms, weddings and funerals for the community of Woughton Parish. Maintaining the medieval church building and its surrounding churchyard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 09 December 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WOUGHTON PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL | Trustee | 27 April 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £704 | £719 | £734 | £750 | £766 | |
|
Total expenditure | £704 | £719 | £734 | £750 | £766 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 193 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 559 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 559 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 11TH JANUARY 1991
Charitable objects
IN OR TOWARDS THE UPKEEP AND REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF WOUGHTON-ON-THE-GREEN IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WOUGHTON.
Area of benefit
WOUGHTON ON THE GREEHN
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 PYKE HAYES
TWO MILE ASH
MILTON KEYNES
MK8 8PQ
- Phone:
- 01908265067
- Email:
- office@woughton.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window