MANCHESTER 500 GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORCYCLISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manchester 500 Group of Advanced Motorcyclists are affiliated to the Institute of Advanced Motorists. We offer courses throughout the year that help motorcycle riders to reach Advanced Test standard and enable them to take and pass the Test. We also have a social side to the group offering a variety of motorcycle related activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Derbyshire
- Manchester City
- Salford City
- Stockport
Governance
- 09 December 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW MELTON | Chair | 10 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Steven Deakin | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Shepley | Trustee | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Maxwell | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Fullalove | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tony Bailey | Trustee | 09 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Murphy | Trustee | 26 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fintan Doran | Trustee | 26 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER KELLY | Trustee | 10 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.34k | £2.24k | £2.80k | £2.84k | £2.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.10k | £1.84k | £1.96k | £2.97k | £5.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE STANDARD OF DRIVING AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF ROAD SAFETY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Lowestead Road
MANCHESTER
M11 4HL
- Phone:
- 07768910081
- Email:
- andrew.melton@mcr500.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window