Trustees MANCHESTER 500 GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORCYCLISTS
Charity number: 1059675

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW MELTON | Chair | 10 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Steven Deakin | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Shepley | Trustee | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Maxwell | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Fullalove | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tony Bailey | Trustee | 09 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Murphy | Trustee | 26 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fintan Doran | Trustee | 26 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER KELLY | Trustee | 10 March 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.