TRIRATNA SOUTHAMPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Meditation/ Buddhism classes and courses provided to public. Further classes for people wishing to deepen their Buddhist practice and/or join the Western Buddhist Order. Visits to schools and hospitals offered. Buddhist prison chaplain associated with charity. Point of contact offered for enquiries by public/ Council eg on funerals. Community living by Buddhists encouraged and subsidised.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 10 December 1996: Standard registration
- FWBO SOUTHAMPTON (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF THE WESTERN BUDDHIST ORDER, SOUTHAMPTON (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Weston | Chair | 18 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Smith | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Luker | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Garry Sawyer | Trustee | 22 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gill Knight | Trustee | 30 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mary Whittaker | Trustee | 11 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.07k | £32.00k | £30.93k | £40.56k | £37.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.39k | £32.54k | £29.91k | £35.30k | £35.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 April 2024 | 160 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 April 2024 | 160 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/05/1994 AS AMENDED ON 21/11/1996 AS AMENDED ON 15/02/2015 AS AMENDED ON 11/04/2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BUDDHIST RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) ENCOURAGING MEMBERS AND OTHERS TO LIVE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHING OF THE BUDDHA. 2) SUPPORTING ORDAINED MEMBERS OF THE TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY AND OTHER DULY ORDAINED BUDDHISTS, AT THE DISCRETION OF THE COUNCIL OF THE ASSOCIATION. 3) MAINTAINING CLOSE COMMUNICATION WITH AND WORKING UNDER THE GUIDANCE OF THE TRIRATNA BUDDHIST ORDER AND IN CO-OPERATION WITH OTHER GROUPS WITH THE SAME OBJECTS. 4) USING APPLICATIONS OF THE BUDDHA'S TEACHING TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND WELL BEING OF ALL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Southampton Buddhist Centre
73-74 St. Mary Street
St. Marys
SOUTHAMPTON
SO14 1NW
- Phone:
- 07940256731
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window