THE RIVER HOUSE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CARE AND SUPPORT SERVICES TO LOCAL INDIVIDUALS AFFECTED BY HIV
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 23 December 1996: Standard registration
- RIVER HOUSE (Working name)
- THE RIVER HOUSE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Christopher Antony Rogers | Chair | 01 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Meg Dillon | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Booth | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Jose Catalan | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|||||
IAN GOVENDIR | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Michael Rayment | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARK NELSON | Trustee | 25 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
DEAN NICHOLSON | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £207.14k | £391.54k | £233.76k | £206.58k | £183.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £352.18k | £338.72k | £213.13k | £230.30k | £230.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.98k | £40.51k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 24 February 2020 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/9/96 REVISED 27 JANUARY 2004 as amended on 29 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AMONGST PERSONS WHO ARE HIV POSITIVE OR WHO ARE LIVING WITH AIDS, OR THOSE AFFECTED BY HIV/AIDS, BY THE PROVISION OF CARE SUPPORT AND COUNSELLING TO THOSE WHO ARE HIV POSITIVE AND TO PEOPLE WITH AIDS AND THEIR FAMILIES, AND PEOPLE CARING FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAMMERSMITH AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FURNIVAL GARDENS
OFF RUTLAND GROVE
HAMMERSMITH
LONDON
W6 9DJ
- Phone:
- 02087415733
- Email:
- info@riverhouseuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window