FAMILY HEALTH - ISIS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Family Health Isis promotes the safeguard of people with mental health challenges living in the boroughs of Lewisham and Greenwich of African Carribbean/African descent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Total income includes £335,836 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Greenwich
- Lewisham
Governance
- 18 December 1996: Standard registration
- 04 June 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
- ISIS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £468.75k | £416.66k | £423.49k | £352.41k | £336.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £448.95k | £424.96k | £398.56k | £346.50k | £353.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £412.87k | £345.67k | £335.84k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 10 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 10 January 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 15/11/96
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND THE SAFEGUARDING OF MENTAL HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING WITH MENTAL DISORDER IN PARTICULAR THOSE OF AFRICAN CARIBBEAN DISCENT
Area of benefit
IN PARTICULAR AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN DESCENT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window