AMBER COMMUNITIES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amber Communities Trust supports a programme of community development with projects on education, the environment, health and heritage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- India
Governance
- 10 December 1996: Standard registration
- JYOTI CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr LATA KLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr RASHMI DICKINSON MBA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr EDWARD JUSTIN DICKINSON MA MBA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.20k | £260 | £0 | £15 | £122 | |
|
Total expenditure | £60 | £69 | £96 | £72 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 11 January 2022 | 340 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 NOVEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 6 DECEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS OF RURAL COMMUNITIES IN ASIA, AFRICA AND ELSEWHERE IN THE DEVELOPING WORLD BY ADVANCING THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF WOMEN AND OTHERS SO AS TO INCREASE THEIR KNOWLEDGE AND TO IMPROVE THEIR OPPORTUNITIES TO FIND GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE ASIA, AFRICA AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat D179
Parliament View Apartments
1 Albert Embankment
LONDON
SE1 7XQ
- Phone:
- 02085602008
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window