THE FINNISH SATURDAY SCHOOL IN CAMBERLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides educational and cultural activities for the Finnish community in the Camberley area. These include tuition to children and adults in the Finnish language, organisation of social events of interest to those who have a connection with Finland and to provide a centre for Finnish people living in the Camberley area to socialise with their fellow Finns.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 13 December 1996: Standard registration
- CAMBERLEYN LAUANTAIKOULU (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timo Rinttila | Chair | 15 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Niina Trangmar | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sebastian Alexander George Puncher | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matti Tapani Kohonen | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emilia Anneli Leah | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eeva Forde | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Satu Glaser | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Minna Woodward | Trustee | 18 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.15k | £877 | £9.36k | £10.86k | £13.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.43k | £877 | £11.49k | £10.22k | £11.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 21/9/96 AS AMENDED ON 15 SEP 2018 as amended on 29 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
[1] to advance education in the Finnish language, Finnish affairs, history and culture for the public benefit.
Area of benefit
CAMBERLEY (SURREY) AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Ashley Way
West End
WOKING
Surrey
GU24 9NJ
- Phone:
- 07826553577
- Email:
- contact@suomikoulu.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window