Financial history ROTARY DISTRICT 1180 TRUST

Charity number: 1059716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £17.66k £23.41k £24.20k £24.04k £15.44k
Total expenditure £17.61k £23.36k £25.78k £23.58k £12.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A