Financial history GORDONSTOUN ASSOCIATION TRUST

Charity number: 1059718
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012
Total gross income £123 £164 £105 £90 £153
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A