EMMAUS CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities include the practice and proclamation of the Christian faith through corporate worship and preaching. Prayer and study in small groups. Visiting and caring for the elderly, sick and those in need. Christian education of children through family activities and school assemblies. Financial support of other Christian charities that bring relief to those in need in this country and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bristol City
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 12 December 1996: Standard registration
- EMMAUS CHURCH TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Conradie-Faul | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Joy Elizabeth Nurcombe | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Luke Samuel Addison | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Peter Isaac Marsh | Trustee | 30 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAMIAN PAUL SELBY | Trustee | 30 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARK WILLIAM CHATTAWAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAMUEL JOHN MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.64k | £33.98k | £35.99k | £36.43k | £43.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.30k | £24.20k | £25.08k | £33.43k | £49.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT THE THE FIRST SCHEDULE HERETO AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD IN THE SAID COUNTY AND ELSEWHERE BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LLITERATURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Churchside
Gorse Cover Road
Severn Beach
BRISTOL
BS35 4NP
- Phone:
- 01454632274
- Email:
- emmauschurch1993@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window