Financial history HI KIDZ

Charity number: 1059759
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2004 31/10/2005 31/10/2006 31/10/2007 31/10/2008
Total gross income £30.02k £20.32k £27.06k £406 £15
Total expenditure £28.22k £23.17k £18.66k £7.13k £50
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A