THE GLENDALE GATEWAY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Centre, Youth Hostel, social housing, community and exhibition space. Other Glendale wide initiatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £26,813 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northumberland
Governance
- 12 December 1996: Standard registration
- 05 December 2024: Funds received from 510298 WOOLER CARNIVAL FUND
- GLENDALE GATEWAY TRUST (Working name)
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rose Lovett | Chair | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Stuart Davidson | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthea Wood | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Russel Walsh | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £499.05k | £285.47k | £229.60k | £273.07k | £360.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £266.20k | £220.97k | £272.00k | £260.28k | £354.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £200.19k | £56.68k | £16.94k | £10.00k | £26.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/06/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/11/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/05/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/04/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE, ENCOURAGE AND ADVANCE THE BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF WOOLER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA COMPRISING THAT AREA ADMINISTERED BY THE FORMER RURAL DISTRICT COUNCIL OF GLENDALE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM)
Area of benefit
IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE THE TOWN OF WOOLER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA ADMINISTERED BY THE FORMER RURAL DISTRICT COUNCIL OF GLENDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHEVIOT CENTRE
THE GLENDALE GATEWAY TRUST
12 PADGEPOOL PLACE
WOOLER
NORTHUMBERLAND
NE71 6BL
- Phone:
- 01668282406
- Email:
- sue@wooler.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window