TOWER HAMLETS PARENTS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ESOL, Literacy and Numeracy Classes, Representing children in admission appeals, disciplinary and exclusion hearings, Parenting Skills Courses, Saturday and Sunday Homework Clubs, Educational Advice and Information, Summer Holiday Programme, Annual Parents+ö+ç+û Conference, Educational Workshops
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 12 December 1996: Standard registration
- PARENTS'CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mukul Chandra Ray | Trustee | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
FERDOUS AHMED | Trustee | 21 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
MONIRUL ISLAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GULAM MORTUZA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Shahanur Khan | Trustee |
|
||||||
SHAFI AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.97k | £99.57k | £74.52k | £81.24k | £73.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.06k | £101.33k | £80.60k | £91.31k | £96.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.53k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 5 SEPTEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION WHICH HELPS PARENTS LIVING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS UNDERSTAND THE EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN AND THEREBY ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN PARENTING SKILLS
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tower Hamlets Parents Centre
1 Links Yard
London
E1 5LX
- Phone:
- 02076508936
- Email:
- parentscentre@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window