Accounts and annual returns ST MARGARET'S SCHOOL BUSHEY ENDOWMENT FUND
Charity number: 1059783
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | 15 January 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | 30 May 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | 15 May 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | 24 May 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | 04 April 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | 26 May 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | 26 May 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2004 | 21 June 2005 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2004 | 21 June 2005 | 21 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window