CYFEILLION MAES GARMON

Charity Number: 1059787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

WE ORGANIZE EVENTS WITH THE HELP OF PARENTS, TEACHERS AND CHILDREN OF YSGOL MAES GARMON TO RAISE MONEY TO BUY EQUIPMENT FOR SPECIFIC DEPARTMENTS IN THE SCHOOL OR FOR THE SCHOOL IN GENERAL.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £134
Total expenditure: £153

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Flintshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 December 1996: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 31 January 2012: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CYFEILLION YSGOL MAES GARMON (Working name)
  • YR UNIG ENN YW (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christie Ryder Trustee 14 January 2025
None on record
Neil Baglin Trustee 23 September 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.12k £22 £18 £20 £134
Total expenditure £473 £143 £128 £140 £153
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 October 2024 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 November 2022 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Christie Ryder Chair Cyfeillion YMG
Care Of Ysgol Maes Garmon
Conway Street
Mold
Flintshire
CH7 1JB
Phone:
07580916106
Website:

No information available