LEYLAND TRUCKS HELPING HAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support individual worthy causes within the employees and family where possible whilst staying close to our committee guidelines.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
Governance
- 13 December 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phil Jones | Chair | 13 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
KAREN SUSSAMS | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
KAREN GALLAGHER | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
WENDY OXLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM JUST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.10k | £64.13k | £55.99k | £65.82k | £72.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.98k | £69.26k | £57.83k | £57.54k | £31.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 JANUARY 1994 AS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 21 NOVEMBER 1996 as amended on 22 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO MAKE DONATIONS TO ANY CHARITABLE ORGANISATION OR FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE WITHIN THE PRESTON AREA (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME
Area of benefit
PRESTON AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leyland Trucks Ltd
Croston Road
Farington Moss
Leyland
PR26 6LZ
- Phone:
- 01772 625827
- Website:
-
lthelpinghand.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window