Maidenhead and Windsor Childminding Group

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and provide facilities for childminders and provide recreation and educational opportunities for children within their daily care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 16 December 1996: Standard registration
- MAIDENHEAD CHILDMINDING GROUP (Previous name)
- MAINENHEAD CHILDMINDING GROUP (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Stevens | Chair | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Burton | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.95k | £2.41k | £2.80k | £3.63k | £3.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.45k | £1.82k | £3.46k | £3.44k | £3.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 March 2021 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MARCH 1996 as amended on 20 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, AND IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 8 YEARS AND PROMOTE THE OBSERVANCE OF GOOD STANDARDS OF CHILDMINDING BY THE PARENTS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND ALL PERSONS AND ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING SUCH FACILITIES. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDMINDERS AND OTHER PERSONS AND ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING DAY CARE FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN AND IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 8 YEARS TO CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF THE CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF SUCH CHILDREN, AND PUBLISH TO USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
MAIDENHEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Bannard Road
Maidenhead
SL6 4NR
- Phone:
- 07776420645
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window