THE BLACK DYKE BAND (1855) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Black Dyke Band enjoyed a successful year in 2013, playing in concerts, releasing new recordings, taking part in competitions and continuing its work with young people through the Yorkshire Youth Brass Band.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 16 December 1996: Standard registration
- BLACK DYKE BAND (Working name)
- BLACK DYKE BANK 1855 (Working name)
- THE BLACK DYKE BAND 1855 LIMITED (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR PAUL CAFFULL | Chair | 03 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
DUNCAN BECKLEY | Trustee | 11 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DICKINSON | Trustee | 11 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BRIAN BILLING | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN O'BRIEN | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JOHN PEARSON | Trustee | 13 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL GARETH WOODWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GORDON HAIGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr NICHOLAS JOHN CHILDS DMA,MA | Trustee |
|
||||||
WILLIAM IAN THOMPSON JP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.51k | £207.81k | £207.21k | £231.45k | £229.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.63k | £117.10k | £162.19k | £177.97k | £165.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.90k | £78.47k | £45.65k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28 NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE MATTER OF THE ARTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Black Dyke Band
Bandroom
Sandbeds
Queensbury
BRADFORD
West Yor
- Phone:
- 07976 825451
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window