Financial history HATHERLEIGH SCHOOL PTFA

Charity Number: 1059816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.58k £8.51k £10.73k £9.82k £14.18k
Total expenditure £8.78k £10.11k £14.57k £6.69k £8.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A