Accounts and annual returns BRITISH CHINESE ARTISTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1059823
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 27 May 2009 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 29 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 23 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 09 March 2006 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required