BRITISH CHINESE ARTISTS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational and chineses arts activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 December 1996: Standard registration
- 18 November 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- B C A A (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.88k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.09k | £852 | £852 | £350 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 27 May 2009 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 29 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 23 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 09 March 2006 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 10 JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF THE FULL SPECTRUM OF THE ART FORMS PRACTISED BY ARTISTS OF CHINESE ORIGIN IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHICH INCLUDES VISUAL AND PERFORMING ARTS, LITERATURE, DESIGN, FILM, VIDEO, MUSIC, MIMING AND CRAFTS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window