WITTERSHAM SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1059824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide additional equipment, facilities and events for the primary school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £16,966
Total expenditure: £7,930

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 December 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ann Elizabeth Rogers Chair 01 November 2018
None on record
Elle Homewood Trustee 13 January 2023
None on record
Alex Dean Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Emily Player Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Bettina Leech Trustee 09 March 2022
None on record
Hayley Clare Tait Trustee 09 March 2022
None on record
Rachael Louise Cooper Trustee 09 February 2022
None on record
Kelly Anne Krzykowska Trustee 04 October 2021
None on record
Emily Hughes Trustee 04 October 2021
None on record
Helen-Marie Thompson Trustee 01 September 2012
None on record
Helena Sargent Trustee 09 January 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £8.12k £5.09k £1.88k £11.12k £16.97k
Total expenditure £8.83k £3.76k £1.71k £9.91k £7.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 March 2021 269 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Brick On Edge Cottage
Station Road
Appledore
ASHFORD
Kent
TN26 2DE
Phone:
07795954474
Website:

No information available