Accounts and annual returns CHERNOBYL CHILDREN'S PROJECT (UK)

Charity number: 1059832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 02 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 02 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 07 February 2025 192 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 07 February 2025 192 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 18 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 18 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 23 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 23 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 12 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window