CHURCH STRETTON TUESDAY DAY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Day centre meets Tuesdays providing door to door transport, refreshments all day, including a hot two-course meal. Various activities, board games, gentle exercises to music, speakers, quiz sessions, annual outings, restaurant meals, Christmas, seasonal, birthday celebrations. Aim - To provide interesting, fulfilling Tuesdays for elderly members, the majority of whom live alone.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
Governance
- 17 December 1996: Standard registration
- 31 March 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CHURCH STRETTON TEUSDAY DAY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.25k | £6.34k | £6.66k | £7.78k | £679 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.98k | £8.64k | £6.66k | £6.67k | £423 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 05 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 20 August 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 SEPTEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLEY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE PARISH OF CHURCH STRETTON
Area of benefit
CHURCH STRETTON AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window