ECO CENTRE (WALES)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects and principal activities continue to be those of the advancement of public education in all aspects of energy conservation. In furtherance of these objects, its policy is to operate Centres offering free and impartial advice to the public. Over 17,000 households in Mid and West Wales were advised in 2007, while in North Wales over 10,000 enquiries were received.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 18 December 1996: Standard registration
- 11 March 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WEST WALES ECO-CENTRE (Previous name)
- WEST WALES ENERGY GROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £347.25k | £486.64k | £524.13k | £365.90k | £68.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £468.95k | £446.20k | £627.38k | £406.01k | £115.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £194.49k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £15.09k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £313.58k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £980 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £620.16k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £7.22k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 22 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 22 August 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 27 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 27 August 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 09 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 09 October 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 AUGUST 1996 AS AMENDED 6 AUGUST 2003 AND 25 NOVEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
1) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF ENERGY CONSERVATION AND USE 2) RELIEF OF FUEL POVERTY THEREBY PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF THOSE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES 3) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS RELATING TO ENERGY CONSERVATION AND USE: FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window