Trustees EASTON COMMUNITY CHILDRENS CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1059859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elwynne Green Chair 16 March 2021
None on record
Anna Louise Proyer Trustee 14 March 2025
None on record
Cathy Coldrey Trustee 08 November 2022
None on record
John Joseph Rossiter Trustee 17 January 2017
None on record
Serena Drysdale Trustee 07 March 2014
None on record