GRESSENHALL RELIEF CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Income from rent of land and unit trusts. Gives out annual donations to people living in the village who are considered in need. Also one off donations given to people at particular time of need e.g. death of spouse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 23 December 1996: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL DUDLEY CRISP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev Julia Houston | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
COLONEL HAMISH GRANT MACKINLEY | Trustee | 30 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WILLIAM DUFFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOLLY CRISP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.34k | £1.48k | £1.44k | £2.15k | £3.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.02k | £2.25k | £840 | £2.38k | £2.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 31ST OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
(1) THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OFM THE ANCIENT PARISH OF GRESSENHALL WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS. (2) THE TRUSTEES MAY PAY FOR SUCH ITEMS, SERVICE OR FACILITIES BY WAY OF DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS TO INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS WHICH PROVIDE OR WHICH UNDERTAKE IN RETURN TO PROVIDE SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS. (3) IN EXCEPTIONAL CASES THE TRUSTEES MAY GRANT RELIEF TO PERSONS OTHERWISE ELIGIBLE THEREFOR WHO ARE RESIDENT IMMEDIATELY OUTSIDE THE SAID AREA BUT IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES OUGHT NEVERTHELESS FOR SUFFICIENT REASON TO BE TREATED AS IF RESIDENT THEREIN OR WHO ARE LOCATED FOR THE TIME BEING WITHIN THAT AREA.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF GRESSENHALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
GLEBE COTTAGE
CHURCH LANE
GRESSENHALL
DEREHAM
NR19 2QQ
- Phone:
- 01362860488
- Email:
- molly.crisp@netcom.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window