THETFORD MUNICIPAL AND UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity Number: 1059877
Charity reporting is up to date (141 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision & maintenance of almshouses

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £25,672
Total expenditure: £24,984

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 December 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MUNICIPAL AND UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAMELA SPENCER Chair
THETFORD MUNICIPAL AND UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOSEPH WILLIAMSON FOR APPRENTICING
Received: On time
JANE LILLIAN JAMES Trustee 21 February 2018
CHARITY OF SIR JOSEPH WILLIAMSON FOR APPRENTICING
Received: On time
THETFORD MUNICIPAL AND UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Brenda Canham Trustee 31 March 2017
THE CHARLES BURRELL MUSEUM
Received: On time
THETFORD MUNICIPAL AND UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOSEPH WILLIAMSON FOR APPRENTICING
Received: On time
Sylvia Armes Trustee 14 February 2015
CHARITY OF SIR JOSEPH WILLIAMSON FOR APPRENTICING
Received: On time
THETFORD MUNICIPAL AND UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
PATRICIA PEARSON Trustee 01 October 2014
CHARITY OF SIR JOSEPH WILLIAMSON FOR APPRENTICING
Received: On time
THETFORD MUNICIPAL AND UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Denis Crawford Trustee 01 October 2014
CHARITY OF SIR JOSEPH WILLIAMSON FOR APPRENTICING
Received: On time
THETFORD MUNICIPAL AND UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
GERALD BASS Trustee
THETFORD MUNICIPAL AND UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOSEPH WILLIAMSON FOR APPRENTICING
Received: On time
TERENCE LAMB Trustee
THETFORD MUNICIPAL AND UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOSEPH WILLIAMSON FOR APPRENTICING
Received: On time
MICHAEL SPENCER Trustee
THETFORD MUNICIPAL AND UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOSEPH WILLIAMSON FOR APPRENTICING
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £25.04k £25.53k £26.69k £26.00k £25.67k
Total expenditure £18.69k £39.06k £10.52k £45.77k £24.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 March 2025 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 21 March 2025 141 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 November 2024 380 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 14 November 2024 380 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 June 2023 224 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 June 2023 224 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 November 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 November 2021 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 March 2021 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 March 2021 135 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 PRIMROSE CLOSE
THETFORD
IP24 2XD
Phone:
01842751351
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available