THE ORLANDO CHAMBER CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Orlando Chamber Choir is a small London based choir which exists to promote enjoyment of music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 23 December 1996: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Lionel Wills | Chair | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mateusz Solinski | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
George Benjamin Edwards | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zita Toth | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Sugden | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daniel Bamford | Trustee | 13 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bettina Weichert | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.70k | £7.13k | £12.28k | £21.67k | £31.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.08k | £5.19k | £18.21k | £15.29k | £22.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 17 June 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST SEPTEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED ON 13 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE COMMITTEE (AS HEREINAFTER DEFINED) MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Netherlands Road
New Barnet
BARNET
Hertfordshire
EN5 1BN
- Phone:
- 00000000000
- Email:
- info@orlandochoir.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window