SURREY SPORTS AND RECREATION ASSOCIATION FOR DISABLED PEOPLE (SPREAD)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a forum for clubs providing sporting opportunities for the disabled in the Surrey area. To organise sporting competitions for the disabled To give financial support to clubs and individuals in the Surrey area who wish to participate in sporting opportunities for the disabled
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 23 December 1996: Standard registration
- SPREAD (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marcus Liddell | Chair | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA GOLDRING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £376 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £452 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH DECEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF SPORT AND PHYSICAL RECREATION FOR PEOPLE HAVING A PHYSICAL, SENSORY OR MENTAL DISABILITY BY CO-ORDINATING, ENCOURAGING AND DEVELOPING THE PROVISION OF SPORT AND RECREATION FOR DISABLED PEOPLE WITHIN THE MEMBER CLUBS THROUGHOUT THE COUNTY OF SURREY AND NEIGHBOURING DISTRICTS.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF SURREY AND NEIGHBOURING DISTRICTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Foxglove Close
Winkfield Row
BRACKNELL
Berkshire
RG42 7NW
- Phone:
- 07753133295
- Email:
- marcusliddell68@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window