BALDERSTONE PARISH FUND

Charity number: 1059900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Fund exists to support the work Balderstone Parish Church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £3,697
Total expenditure: £2,143

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 December 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Singleton Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
KEITH ROBERTS Trustee
THE CARR CHARITY (ALSO KNOWN AS RATCLIFF AND OTHERS)
Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN BLACKBURN
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.35k £3.40k £3.12k £3.41k £3.70k
Total expenditure £2.85k £4.05k £4.04k £3.08k £2.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 February 2025 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 March 2022 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 March 2021 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FAIRCLOUGH WEST
COMMONS LANE
BALDERSTONE
BLACKBURN
BB2 7LP
Phone:
01254813058