HOLBROOKS COMMUNITY CARE ASSOCIATION RESOURCE AND INFORMATION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Outreach drop in information service covering a range of local and city wide services and amenities. welfare benefits, debt and general advice on a wide range of issues UK Online centre offering community computer training and internet access for residents. Jobs Club and Employment Support. Community Events, Silver Surfers Computer Club, partnership community library
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £36,180 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 20 December 1996: Standard registration
- H C C A (Working name)
- HOLBROOKS COMMUNITY CARE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ISABELLE OSBORNE | Chair | 22 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Groves | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Jane Dixon | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Margaret Yardley | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah - Jane Evans | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Brendan Duggan | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANN LUCAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.93k | £86.00k | £66.49k | £188.10k | £155.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.19k | £52.43k | £66.23k | £142.24k | £138.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £3.23k | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.00k | £34.67k | £12.00k | £39.84k | £36.18k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED 1 JUNE 1999
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED TO (A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HOLBROOKS AND SURROUNDING AREA (HERINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT")IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION IN A COMMON EFFORT TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND (B) TO EDUCATE AND ASSIST YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
HOLBROOKS AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Park
115 Holbrook Lane
Holbrooks
COVENTRY
CV6 4DE
- Phone:
- 02476638681
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window